CT HB06074 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce by fifty per cent certain fees for certain occupational licenses, certifications, registrations or permits for veterans and their spouses.
Title
An Act Reducing By Fifty Per Cent Certain Fees For Certain Occupational Licenses, Certifications, Registrations Or Permits For Veterans And Their Spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-22 | House | File Number 118 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 113 |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |