CT HB06041 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit a nonprofit organization to sell or promote the sale of raffle tickets on such organization's Internet web site.
Title
An Act Permitting Nonprofit Organizations To Sell Raffle Tickets Online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 437 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Act 17-161 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | House | File Number 801 |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 545 |
2017-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7808 |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 282 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 212 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2017-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |