CT HB06033 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To deter distracted driving.
Title
An Act Concerning Distracted Driving And Revisions To The Motor Vehicle Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 588 PASS (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 315 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 315 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-271 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | Senate | File Number 890 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 675 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2013-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8291 |
2013-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-03 | House | File Number 323 |
2013-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 223 |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |