CT HB06025 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow medical assistants to administer vaccines.
Title
An Act Allowing Medical Assistants To Administer Vaccines Under Supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 343 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 601 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8671 |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 281 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 211 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |