CT HB05926 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow for the inspection of shipments of beer, spirits and wine shipped into Connecticut from out of state, to allow for verification for taxation and public health purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inspection Of Out-of-state Shipments Of Alcoholic Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2017-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |