CT HB05902 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding to the Board of Regents for Higher Education to purchase equipment necessary for students to successfully complete advanced manufacturing certificate programs.
Title
An Act An Act Concerning Funding For Advanced Manufacturing Certificate Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2021-02-24 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |