CT HB05898 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide aid in dying to terminally ill patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Aid In Dying For Terminally Ill Patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseVote to Hold Until Next Meeting
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-14HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback