CT HB05886 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit municipalities to use Local Capital Improvement Fund grants for the removal of dead or dangerous trees located near municipal roads and buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of Local Capital Improvement Fund Grants For The Removal Of Certain Trees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-01HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 278
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 184
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-30HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback