CT HB05886 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a credit against the personal income tax or the corporation business tax for agricultural food commodities grown or produced by the taxpayer and donated to a food bank or an emergency feeding organization in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Donated Agricultural Food Commodities Produced Or Grown By The Taxpayer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 436 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseVetoed by the Governor
2017-06-23HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-23HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-19HousePublic Act 17-159
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed
2017-05-26HouseSenate Calendar Number 544
2017-05-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Passed
2017-05-09HouseFile Number 731
2017-05-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 492
2017-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-05-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM
2017-04-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-27HouseJoint Favorable
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2017-04-24HouseDrafted by Committee
2017-04-11HouseVote to Draft
2017-02-17HousePublic Hearing 02/24
2017-02-14HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback