CT HB05879 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - File Number 496
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - File Number 496
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt certain contact information in the custody of a member of the General Assembly from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
An Act Exempting Certain Contact Information From Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | File Number 496 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 363 |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-03 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |