CT HB05858 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow for the purchase of lifetime hunting and fishing licenses, permits and stamps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Authorizing Lifetime Hunting And Fishing Licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2017-05-09HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2017-05-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-09HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-08HouseJoint Favorable
2017-05-05HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2017-03-28HouseFile Number 252
2017-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 192
2017-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-13HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2017-01-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2017-01-23HouseVote to Draft
2017-01-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback