CT HB05836 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/17
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/17
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for any medical evaluation or appointment with a health care provider ordered by a state court for an insured and any treatment required as a result of such evaluation or appointment.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Medical Evaluations Or Appointments Ordered By A Court For An Insured And Any Subsequent Treatment Required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |