CT HB05836 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for a greater distribution of animal population control funds to programs that assist persons with low incomes to have the dog or cat they purchased from a municipal or state pound sterilized and vaccinated.
Title
An Act Concerning The Availability Of Funding For The Vaccination And Sterilization Of Dogs And Cats Owned By Low Income Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 436 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-99 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 555 |
2013-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 500 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 317 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2013-02-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |