CT HB05833 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a pilot program to expand advanced manufacturing certificate programs offered by regional community-technical colleges to eight public high schools throughout the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For The Expansion Of Advanced Manufacturing Certificate Programs.

Sponsors

House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee CommitteeRep. Kara Rochelle [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]
Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Themis Klarides [R]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]
Rep. Jason Rojas [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Rep. Joshua Hall [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Sen. George Logan [R]Rep. Robin Comey [D]Sen. Joan Hartley [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]Rep. Kurt Vail [R]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]
Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]
Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Maria Horn [D]Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]
Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]
Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]Rep. John Hampton [D]
Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R]Rep. David Rutigliano [R]Rep. Timothy Ackert [R]
Rep. Tom O'Dea [R]Rep. Charles Ferraro [R]Rep. Irene Haines [R]Rep. Devin Carney [R]
Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Whit Betts [R]
Rep. William Petit [R]Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]
Rep. Henry Genga [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]
Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]Rep. Jesse MacLachlan [R]Rep. Christie Carpino [R]
Rep. Douglas Dubitsky [R]Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Sen. Robert Sampson [R]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]
Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]
Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Rep. Joseph Serra [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 423 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-103
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-05-31SenateFile Number 1020
2019-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 638
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10196
2019-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10177
2019-04-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-16HouseNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-04-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-15HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Education
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 277
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 183
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-07HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05833&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00103-R00HB-05833-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R00HED-CV8-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R00HED-CV28-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R00HED-CV60-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05833-R00ED-CV59-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00244-R00HB05833-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00423-R00HB05833-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback