CT HB05829 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 276
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To add two additional student members to the Board of Regents for Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Student Membership On The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 276
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 182
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback