CT HB05829 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 276
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 276
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To add two additional student members to the Board of Regents for Higher Education.
Title
An Act Increasing The Student Membership On The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. John Frey [R] | Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D] |
Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 276 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 182 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |