CT HB05816 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To no longer require the use of inner and outer envelopes in absentee balloting.
Title
An Act Concerning Absentee Ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 674 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 410 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |