CT HB05756 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - File Number 717
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - File Number 717
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include a dental hygienist on the State Dental Commission.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Dental Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | File Number 717 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 404 |
2017-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6133 |
2017-04-04 | House | File Number 384 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 279 |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-16 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |