CT HB05739 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the property tax exemption for a surviving spouse or minor child of a serviceman or veteran to a parent of such serviceman or veteran if there is no surviving spouse or minor child.
Title
An Act Concerning A Property Tax Exemption For A Parent Of A Deceased Serviceman Or Veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |