CT HB05720 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reestablish the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee.
Title
An Act Reestablishing The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | File Number 268 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 177 |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |