CT HB05709 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require additional public notice of abandoned property that has been transferred to the Treasurer and to require the Treasurer to give notice to municipalities that have property that has escheated to the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Additional Notification Regarding Abandoned Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-18HouseFile Number 748
2019-04-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 446
2019-04-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback