CT HB05709 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 514
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 514
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection from going beyond what is required under federal law in designating stormwater sewer systems outside of urban areas.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection's Authority To Designate Additional Stormwater Sewer Systems Outside Of Urban Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 514 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 320 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2015-02-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |