CT HB05708 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enable the remediation of the Connecticut Transit site located at 470 James Street in New Haven.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Transit Site In New Haven.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 218 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 149 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2015-02-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |