CT HB05698 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require local and regional boards of education, the Department of Education and the Office of Early Childhood to collect and report data concerning adverse childhood experiences suffered by children.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For The Collection Of Adverse Childhood Experiences Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 198 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 169 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2021-02-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |