CT HB05692 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 612
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 612
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To promote transparency and ethical standards in the execution of contracts by the Connecticut Port Authority by subjecting the authority to supervision of the State Contracting Standards Board permanently.
Title
An Act Concerning Oversight Of Contracts Of The Connecticut Port Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | File Number 612 |
2023-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 394 |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |