CT HB05689 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 03/01
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 03/01
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To better provide for safe residential docks and piers in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring The Development Of A Manual For The Safe Construction Of Residential Piers And Docks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |