CT HB05681 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - File Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - File Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that school building project grants for inclusive municipalities be increased by ten percentage points.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Opportunity Reimbursement And Educational Equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 148 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 137 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |