CT HB05681 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 174
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require creditors, mortgage lenders, mortgage correspondent lenders and mortgage servicers to report to a nationally recognized credit bureau the favorable payment history of certain debtors who have filed a petition for bankruptcy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Certain Lenders And Creditors To Report The Favorable Payment History Of Debtors Who Have Filed A Petition For Bankruptcy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 174
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 124
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback