CT HB05679 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize municipalities to abate up to five hundred dollars per assessment year of property taxes for certain first-time homebuyers obtaining a loan from the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Tax Abatement For Certain First-time Home Buyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 345 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 577 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 147 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 136 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-02-24 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |