CT HB05654 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - File Number 723
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - File Number 723
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require all state agency forms, applications and methods of identification to be updated with a nonbinary gender option.
Title
An Act Concerning An Assessment Of The Updating Of State Forms And Applications To Include A Nonbinary Gender Option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | File Number 723 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 491 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9093 |
2021-04-19 | House | File Number 495 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 362 |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |