CT HB05627 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the sales tax on (1) seasonal parking fees at federal and state parking lots, and (2) parking fees at municipally owned parking lots.
Title
An Act Eliminating The Sales Tax On Parking Fees At Certain Federal, State And Local Parking Lots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 310 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | House | Public Act 16-72 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 475 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 613 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 393 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |