CT HB05620 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit health insurers and other entities from providing coverage for opioid analgesics for more than a thirty-day supply per prescription or refill, and require the Insurance Commissioner to study impediments for insureds to receive substance use disorder treatment and submit a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters related to insurance and public health.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Impediments To Insurance Coverage For Substance Use Disorder Treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 212 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 212 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Special Act 16-4 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 569 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5743 |
2016-04-19 | House | File Number 669 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 424 |
2016-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-18 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-18 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-17 | House | Change of Reference Appropriations |
2016-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |