CT HB05614 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the harbor management act to clarify the right of municipalities to review and make recommendations concerning uses authorized in areas covered by harbor management commissions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revision Of The Harbor Management Act.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Hector Arzeno [D] | Sen. Martha Marx [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2023-02-16 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |