CT HB05608 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that investment advisers inform clients of their ability to name one or more beneficiaries or contingent beneficiaries for their assets.
Title
An Act Requiring Investment Advisers To Inform Clients Of Their Ability To Name Beneficiaries Or Contingent Beneficiaries For Their Assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | File Number 234 |
2021-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 195 |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2021-03-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing 02/09 |
2021-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |