CT HB05592 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To redefine "veteran" and to establish a Qualified Condition Review Board.
Title
An Act Redefining “veteran” And Establishing A Qualifying Review Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-79 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-10 | House | File Number 673 |
2021-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 414 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8049 |
2021-04-06 | House | File Number 255 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 209 |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |