CT HB05586 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To retain a highly educated workforce and strengthen Connecticut's economy.
Title
An Act Making Connecticut More Affordable For College Graduates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |