CT HB05586 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Revise the procedure for forfeiture of property seized pursuant to a criminal violation; (2) increase the penalties and clarify the applicability of, and the statute of limitations for, certain voyeurism violations, including "upskirting", subsequent violations and violations involving children; (3) provide that probation officers may set bail when serving arrest warrants for violations of probation; (4) revise the offense of harassment in the first degree to reference all communications and not only telephone calls; (5) revise the requirement that tests for blood alcohol levels be commenced within two hours of operation in order to be admitted as evidence in a criminal prosecution for drunken driving or drunken boating; (6) increase the penalty for fraudulent use of an automated teller machine; (7) increase the monetary thresholds that determine the various degrees of "issuing a bad check"; and (8) make technical and conforming changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Various Statutes Concerning The Criminal Justice System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 441 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-23 | House | Public Act 14-233 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 585 |
2014-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5506 |
2014-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-25 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-16 | House | File Number 596 |
2014-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 388 |
2014-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |