CT HB05583 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a police officer to take a person into custody when the officer has reasonable cause to believe that such person is experiencing a drug overdose.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Intervention By A Police Officer When A Person Suffers An Overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |