CT HB05579 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for a definite period of license suspension for persons who have had their motor vehicle license suspended for driving while intoxicated but who are indigent and never installed an ignition interlock device.
Title
An Act Concerning Costs For Ignition Interlock Device Services For Persons Who Are Indigent And Are Seeking Restoration Of A Motor Vehicle Operator's License.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Public Act 18-30 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | File Number 679 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 492 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4916 |
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 599 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 401 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |