CT HB05578 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - File Number 418
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - File Number 418
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the sale and trade of ivory and rhinoceros horn in the state.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Sale And Trade Of Ivory And Rhinoceros Horn.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 418 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 283 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |