CT HB05577 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To help households in need of food and reduce food waste in the municipal solid waste stream.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Surplus Food Donation And Establishing Food Composting Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-28HouseFile Number 266
2023-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 175
2023-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2023-02-16HouseDrafted by Committee
2023-02-08HouseVote to Draft
2023-01-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback