CT HB05575 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permit the court to suspend a delinquency proceeding for certain fire starting offenses and order a child to participate in a fire starting behavior treatment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Suspension Of Delinquency Proceedings For Fire Starting Behavior Treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 407 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-135
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 582
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-23HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-23HouseNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseFile Number 51
2019-03-13HouseHouse Calendar Number 45
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-13HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-21HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-02-05HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05575&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00135-R00HB-05575-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R00KID-CV1-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R00KID-CV21-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05575-R00JUD-CV200-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00155-R00HB05575-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00407-R00HB05575-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback