CT HB05575 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To allow a party to a family relations matter to have greater input on the selection of a licensed health care professional who is to provide treatment or an evaluation in connection with such matter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Appointment Of A Qualified, Licensed Health Care Professional To Provide Treatment Or An Evaluation In Connection With A Family Relations Matter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 250 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-30SenatePublic Act 18-177
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 547
2018-05-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5307
2018-04-19HouseFile Number 598
2018-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 400
2018-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-04HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-22HousePublic Hearing 03/26
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback