CT HB05574 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow certain persons to file for a property tax exemption, notwithstanding certain statutory deadlines.
Title
An Act Concerning The Failure To File For Certain Grand List Exemptions, Validating A Connecticut Green Bank Agreement And Certain Actions Of The City Of Derby, Concerning Payment Of A Grant-in-aid To The Town Of Darien And The Criteria Of Certain Members Of School Governance Councils And Extending A Provision Concerning Reemployment Of Certain Teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 237 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 237 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-42 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 538 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5286 |
2018-04-17 | House | File Number 538 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 364 |
2018-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |