CT HB05571 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Trafficking in Persons Council and other provisions to combat human trafficking.
Title
An Act Concerning Human Trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 597 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 399 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |