CT HB05571 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require licensing for companies engaged in the collection of federal income tax debt and to prohibit consumer collection agencies from collecting interest, fees, charges or expenses on debts absent an explicit agreement signed by a consumer debtor to the contrary; (2) protect individuals from causes of action for liability on debt brought by creditors or consumer collection agencies with insufficient evidence of ownership of the debt or association of such debt with the individual.
Title
An Act Concerning Banking And Consumer Protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 169 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 169 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Public Act 16-65 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | File Number 758 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 546 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5426 |
2016-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 417 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 281 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |