CT HB05567 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of the laws of civil procedure and criminal procedure of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Laws Of Civil Procedure And The Laws Of Criminal Procedure Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | File Number 507 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 349 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |