CT HB05563 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Chief Court Administrator to establish a training program for judges regarding mental health and post-traumatic stress disorders affecting veterans involved in the criminal justice system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Training Program For Mental Health And Post-traumatic Stress Disorder Issues Impacting Veterans Involved In The Criminal Justice System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseNo Action
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 141
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 106
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback