CT HB05563 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To criminalize the act of masking the identity of a caller initiating robo calls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Robo Calls And Spoofing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-24SenatePublic Act 18-135
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed
2018-05-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 490
2018-05-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-02SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2018-05-02HouseHouse Passed
2018-04-17HouseFile Number 536
2018-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 362
2018-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-04HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-22HousePublic Hearing 03/26
2018-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback