CT HB05561 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - File Number 734
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - File Number 734
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) set standards for secured and unsecured lending, (2) clarify what constitutes substantively unconscionable terms in a consumer contract written by a party other than the consumer, and (3) make the inclusion of such terms in a consumer contract an unfair and deceptive trade practice under the Connecticut Unfair Trade Practices Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Fairness In Consumer Contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | File Number 734 |
2016-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-26 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 414 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 278 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |